HI HB300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB300
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows courts to authorize a person or entity other than a deputy or an officer to provide technical assistance in executing a search warrant that pertains to an electronic device or storage media. (HB300 HD1)
Title
Relating To Search Warrants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 9). |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB300 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - Referred to JDL.