HI HB332 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires check cashers to be registered with DCCA and to offer a voluntary payment plan to customers under certain circumstances. Establishes the terms of voluntary payment plans. Clarifies that a customer may only have one outstanding deferred deposit transaction from any source. Amends notices to customers required of check cashers. Removes the exemption for persons engaged in the bona fide retail sale of goods or services. Requires the Auditor to conduct a sunrise analysis of the regulation of payday lenders and deferred deposit agreements in the State. (HB332 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Check Cashing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH/GVO, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 160).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 456), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB613 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback