HI HB336 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 234, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Director of Public Safety, in the event of the death of an inmate who is in a state or contracted correctional facility, or death of a correctional facility or community correctional center employee, to report to the Governor, who shall then report to the Legislature, certain information regarding the death, subject to state and federal laws. Requires the Department of Public Safety to preserve any forensic evidence consisting of human biological specimens if there is any indication of sexual assault leading to the death. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hawaii State And Contracted Correctional Facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 234, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
2019-07-09HouseAct 234, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
2019-04-26HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-26SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 871).
2019-04-25HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Thielen excused (2).
2019-04-25HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 862).
2019-04-24HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 857).
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Gates, Kong, Nakamura, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 721) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1860) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 369).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1077 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback