HI HB35 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB35
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the contents required to be submitted in each annual nongeneral fund program measures report and non-general fund cost element report. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Non-general Fund Reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 240). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-17 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-17-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB35 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=35&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB35_HD1_.HTM |