HI HB369 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 700).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 700).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Residential Kitchen Fire Task Force to develop plans to address the dangers of residential kitchen fires. Report to the 2014 Legislature. (SD2)
Title
Fire Safety; Residential Kitchen Fire Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 700). |
2013-04-16 | House | House conferees appointed: Aquino, Rhoads, Ing Co-Chairs; Yamane, McDermott. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 459). |
2013-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 448) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 205). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 884) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, C. Lee, Wooley, McDermott. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |