HI HB372 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB372
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes requirement that common water carriers receive permission from the public utilities commission prior to executing a long-term lease of more than three years or a leverage lease.
Title
Relating To The Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB479 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB372 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
HB372 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=372&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB372_.HTM |