HI HB378 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB378
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Filipino-American World War II veterans burial assistance special fund and appropriates funds for burial grants for qualifying Filipino-American World War II veterans to provide funeral and burial services and transportation of their remains to the Philippines. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Filipino Veterans Burial Assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1373) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 38). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 854), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB378 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1417 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 121, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
SB1417 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 121, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1223).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Burial Grants
Filipino Caucus
Filipino-American World War II Veterans Burial Assistance Special Fund
Office of Veterans' Services
Burial Grants
Filipino Caucus
Filipino-American World War II Veterans Burial Assistance Special Fund
Office of Veterans' Services