HI HB40 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - (S) Act 029, 4/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 487).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - (S) Act 029, 4/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 487).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Act 112, Session Laws of Hawaii 2009, which authorized the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Carbon Diversion Inc. (HB40 HD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Carbon Diversion Inc.; Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | (S) Act 029, 4/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 487). | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Act 029, on 4/16/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 241). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 396). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) One Day Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3051) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2727) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-10 2:50PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 53). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-22-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) HD 1 adopted and recommitted to FIN for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Berg, M. Lee, Nishimoto, M. Oshiro, Pine, Souki excused. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Recommends recommittal to FIN. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429-10) as amended in HD 1. | |
2010-02-17 | (H) The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Sagum, Wooley. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-10 at 10:00 am in conference room 308. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |