HI HB406 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB406
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DBEDT to develop annual regional economic plans for each county to provide K-16 pathways and qualified internship programs to meet each region's specific industry needs. Appropriates funds. (HB406 HD2)
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19 10:00AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EDB, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB406 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB365 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 4:01PM in conference room 224.
SB365 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 4:01PM in conference room 224.