HI HB423 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 119, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 119, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Separates voluntary deregistration of fee non-time share interests from deregistration of time share interests in order to sunset only voluntary deregistration of non-time share interests on December 31, 2014. (HB423 CD1)
Title
Bureau of Conveyances; Sunset Provision; Repeal; Deregistration of Registered Land Other than Fee Time Share Interests
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 119, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 119, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 36). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 36) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, McKelvey, Rhoads, Coffman, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-22-13 at 4:20 PM in Conference Room 016. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 1:05PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Evans, McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Coffman, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to WAL, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 493) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-28-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 859) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL/TEC/CPN, JDL/WAM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 6). |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 6), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-28-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |