HI HB423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 143, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 143, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the qualifications a production must meet in order to claim the credit. Caps the annual amount of tax credits that may be claimed at $35,000,000. Extends the sunset date to January 1, 2026. Requires DBEDT to submit an annual report to the Legislature regarding the activities and expenditures of the tax credit. Clarifies that no rule shall be adopted to expand the scope of the tax credit where the rule conflicts with legislative intent. Requires certain film productions claiming the tax credit to hire an independent third party certification of qualified production costs eligible for the credit. Requires DBEDT, in collaboration with DOTAX, to submit to the Governor and the Legislature a report on the number of jobs created in the State and the fiscal impact of every film production receiving the tax credit in the State. (HB423 CD1)
Title
Relating To Film And Digital Media Industry Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 143, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 143, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Oshiro, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 190). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 190) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Cullen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 3:30PM in Conference Room 309. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 12:55PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Woodson, Ward. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1473) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDL. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to ETT, WAM/JDL. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 256). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 432) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1060 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to ETT, WAM.