HI HB430 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restores funding for positions for the homeless programs office of the department of human services.
Title
Homeless Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Carroll, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Pine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-09-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HSG/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB947 (Same As) 2011-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=430 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB430_.HTM |