HI HB430 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 256, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts charitable income tax deductions from the itemized deduction caps. (HB430 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Itemized Income Tax Deductions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 256, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
2013-07-09HouseAct 256, on 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan, Rhoads voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 118).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 118) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-18HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-17HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Yamashita, Ward.
2013-04-01SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 385).
2013-03-28HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-03-27HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 410) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-27SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-27-13.
2013-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-03-25SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-05SenateReferred to WAM.
2013-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 144).
2013-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-02-28HouseDeferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
2013-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-02-15HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-13HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Ward.
2013-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback