HI HB444 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 117, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 117, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of certain transient accommodations tax revenues for beach restoration and conservation. Makes appropriations for fiscal year 2014-2015 and 2015-2016. Effective upon approval, except for part 1 which is effective 7/1/2016. (CD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Special Land and Development Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 117, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 117, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 151). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 151) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen, Kouchi, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Brower, Cullen, Evans; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward. |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 5:15PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; L. Thielen, Kouchi Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Brower, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, C. Lee, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 536) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from TSI/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Tokuda. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 2:15PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to TSI/WTL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 187). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Keohokalole voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TOU with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TOU. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, TOU, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB617 (Same As) 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.