HI HB444 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 202, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Health to adopt rules for onsite non-potable water reuse systems by January 1, 2021. (HB444 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Onsite-non-potable Water Reuse Systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 202, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
2019-07-09HouseAct 202, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:40PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Todd, Thielen.
2019-04-09SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 638).
2019-04-05HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 655) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1732) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:46PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-21SenateRe-Referred to AEN.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH/AEN.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 43).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 857), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-29HouseRe-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 7
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback