HI HB449 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the financial disclosure statements of members of state boards and commissions holding official authority over permitting or licensing of land use related matters, water use related matters, or the regulation of public utilities public documents and available for public inspection and duplication.
Title
Financial Disclosure Statements; Boards and Commissions; Public Documents
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-04 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-07-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |