HI HB449 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to lower the qualifying age of voters for any state or local election to sixteen years of age.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Amend The Qualifying Age Of Voters For Any State Or Local Election.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB824 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB449 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB449 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=449&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB449_.HTM |