HI HB456 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB456
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to conduct an economic and environmental study of the deposit beverage container program and report to the legislature prior to the regular session of 2022. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB456 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=456&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB456_.HTM |