HI HB526 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of business, economic development, and tourism and the high technology development corporation to plan for a high technology park or technology incubator facility on Oahu. Requires DBEDT to submit preliminary and final reports to the legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/50. (SD2)
Title
High Technology Park; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Wakai. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Chang, Choy Co-Chairs; Hashem, Yamashita, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 472) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1149) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 975) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDT/WLH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-11 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from ERB/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 452) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Herkes. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB/WLO on Tuesday, 02-15-11 11:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |