HI HB527 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain solar energy facilities on lands with soil classified by the land study bureau's detailed land classification as overall (master) productivity rating class B.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB527 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=527&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB527_.HTM |