HI HB533 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Le Jardin Academy, Inc., in planning, designing, constructing, reconstructing, renovating, acquiring, equipping, and improving educational facilities.
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Le Jardin Academy, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-02 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB533 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=533&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB533_.HTM |