HI HB534 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for Board of Land and Natural Resources approval for lease extensions in the Hilo Community Economic District. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to use the current tax assessed value when offering lease extensions to lessees. Requires all applications to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for an extension of fixed rental periods or lease terms to be made within 180 days and confirm lease extensions.
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB79 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB534 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB534 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=534&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB534_.HTM |