HI HB568 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB568
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a prosecution for sex trafficking to be commenced at any time. Includes coercion as a means of committing the offense of sex trafficking. Makes the solicitation of a minor for sex a strict liability offense of sex trafficking. Repeals the offense of solicitation of a minor for prostitution.
Title
Relating To Sex Trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB568 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB831 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
SB831 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HMS, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=568&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB568_.HTM |