HI HB58 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires compensation benefits for volunteer firefighters who are injured or killed in the line of duty to be determined based on equivalent firefighter pay based on years of service and rank, rather than on a rate of $18 per week.
Title
Relating To Compensation Benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB58 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB58 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=58&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB58_.HTM |