HI HB605 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 089, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 089, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the installation or use of household aerobic units that discharge directly to groundwater unless approved by the Director of Health. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Wastewater.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act 089, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2017-07-07 | House | Act 089, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 629). |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har excused (1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2017-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-17. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 498) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Wakai. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 127). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 862), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Fukumoto. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:35AM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-17 10:35AM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:05AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |