HI HB618 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the use of another person's name or persona to create a web page on or to post one or more messages on a commercial social networking site, without the permission of the other person, and with the intent to harm, defraud, intimidate, or threaten any person, a misdemeanor. Makes the repeated commission of this offense a class C felony. Provides that harassment by impersonation, if committed with the intent to solicit a response by emergency services personnel, is a class C felony. Effective January 7, 2059. (HD618 HD1)
Title
Computers; Online Harassment; Aggravated Online Harassment; Harassment by Impersonation
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT, JDL. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 141). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Ito, Luke, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-01-11. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 302. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |