HI HB618 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB618
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an exemption from mediation in paternity proceedings where there are allegations of domestic abuse if the party alleging domestic abuse does not wish to participate. Prohibits a mediator from engaging in mediation where there are allegations of domestic abuse unless certain requisites are met. Prohibits a court from requiring mediation in paternity proceedings if there is a temporary restraining order or a protective order in effect and the party alleging domestic abuse does not wish to participate. Allows the court to order mediation in paternity proceedings where there are allegations of domestic abuse but there is no temporary restraining order or no protective order, under certain circumstances. Replaces the term "family violence" with "domestic abuse" in section 58041.5, HRS.
Title
Relating To Family.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HHS, JDC. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 67). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 351), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB618 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
SB984 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
SB984 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=618&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB618_.HTM |