HI HB635 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB635
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the maximum weekly benefit amount at seventy-five per cent of the average weekly wage from June 1, 2021 to December 31, 2023.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB635 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=635&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB635_.HTM |