HI HB636 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a legislator to disclose each source of annual income derived from a single source that is $25,000 or more, or that represents an amount equal to 25% or more of the legislator's total annual income from all sources, excluding legislative salary, if the source has an interest in legislative outcomes.
Title
Legislators; Disclosure
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-12. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB661 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=636 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB636_.HTM |