HI HB654 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent an exemption from tort liability for the State and counties arising from lifeguard services, but not for gross negligence or wanton acts or omissions.
Title
Relating To State And County Tort Liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB866 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB654 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
HB654 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=654&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB654_.HTM |