HI HB675 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to educate food establishments about liability protections. Expands liability protection for donors to include donations of food and similar donations made directly to needy persons. Authorizes the donation of expired food when the donor believes in good faith that the food remains fit for human consumption. (HB675 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 82) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to AGR, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB675 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).