HI HB68 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 194, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1296).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a merchant in the State from adopting a warranty policy that requires a purchaser to pay an additional fee to obtain a repair, replacement, or refund for goods returned pursuant to the warranty. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 194, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1296).
2019-07-09HouseAct 194, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1296).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-30SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 878).
2019-04-26HouseReconsideration of action taken on 03-28-19.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 898).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-03-29SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 515).
2019-03-28HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-03-27HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 535) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-27SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-27-19.
2019-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-25SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1531) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 140).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB827 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback