HI HB69 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB69
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the distribution of conveyance tax revenues to better fund programs for environmental protection and affordable housing.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB69 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to WAL/EEP, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=69&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB69_.HTM |