HI HB696 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 166, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 166, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Healthcare Workforce Advisory Board to help increase and strengthen the healthcare workforce in the State. Allows the director of labor and industrial relations to establish additional workforce advisory boards. (HB696 CD1)
Title
Hawaii Healthcare Workforce Advisory Board; Workforce Advisory Boards; Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act 166, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Act 166, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Tokuda, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Belatti, Keohokalole, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Belatti, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Har, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to LAB, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 567) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-15 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, JDL/WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 11). |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-17-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 54) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-04-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Re-Referred to HTH/HEA, JDL/WAM.