HI HB696 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB696
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes system access and system integration requirements for the computer software tracking system for medical cannabis dispensaries. Requires the department of health to submit an annual report to the legislature on data captured using the computer software tracking system.
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis Dispensaries.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Saturday, 02-04-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1244 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB696 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB696 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Access Requirements
Computer Software Tracking System
Medical Cannabis Dispensaries
Reporting Requirements
System Integration Requirements
Computer Software Tracking System
Medical Cannabis Dispensaries
Reporting Requirements
System Integration Requirements
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=696&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB696_.HTM |