HI HB697 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 177, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 177, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the auditor to conduct a study of various departmental engineering sections that manage general fund capital improvement projects. Requires the department of accounting and general services to undertake lease buyback processing under the program of centralized engineering and office leasing services, facilitate facility agreements between the State, except the DOT, and private investors, and conduct an inventory of all leases of property between state agencies and private entities. Makes an appropriation. (HB697 CD1)
Title
Auditor; Department of Accounting and General Services; Leases; Facility Agreements; Inventory; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act 177, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2015-07-02 | House | Act 177, on 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 144). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 144) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 9:55AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 9:55AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 9:55AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Ihara, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1544) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-15 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 71). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 380) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2015-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-13-15 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-15. |
2015-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-29 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB165 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to EDB, WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30