HI HB710 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the historic preservation division to consult with native Hawaiian cultural practitioners when any archaeological investigation is conducted that relates to historic or cultural properties, artifacts, burial sites, burial goods, or human skeletal remains.
Title
Historic Preservation; Archaeological Investigation
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW/CUA on Wednesday, 02-02-11 10:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HAW/CUA, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=710 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB710_.HTM |