HI HB710 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources, Department of Health, and Office of Planning to streamline the permitting process and facilitate the restoration of Hawaiian fishponds. Requires DLNR to submit a report of findings and recommendations. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB710 HD1)
Title
Fishponds; Restoration; Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL/THA, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 262). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 75), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |