HI HB712 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Failed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 10; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, Taniguchi . Noes, 15 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Dela Cruz, English, Fevella, Ihara, Inouye, Kanuha, J.Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires candidates for President, Vice President, Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or Mayor to disclose their federal income tax returns to be listed on a general election ballot. Prohibits electors from voting for candidates for President or Vice President if those candidates have not disclosed their federal income tax returns. (HB712 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateFailed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 10; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, Taniguchi . Noes, 15 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Dela Cruz, English, Fevella, Ihara, Inouye, Kanuha, J.Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none).
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1890) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-19 9:45AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 402).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 940) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Thielen.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-31HouseRe-referred to JUD, referral sheet 9
2019-01-24HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback