HI HB747 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 138, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 138, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes definition of convenience minimarts commonly referred to as a "mom and pop store". Effective July 1, 2011. (HB747 CD1)
Title
Intoxicating Liquor; Liability Insurance; Convenience Minimarts
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | (H) Act 138, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241). | |
2011-06-21 | (S) Act 138, 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Hee. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours noticem Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Herkes, Evans, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 4:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, Herkes Co-Chairs; Evans, McKelvey, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, CPC, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 396). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 403) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (English). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-11. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1051) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 03-22-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 2:55PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to PGM,CPN. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 154). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Morita excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-03-11 3:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-03-11. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 25 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |