HI HB759 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Re-Referred to EDU/ENE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Re-Referred to EDU/ENE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE and DAGS, in consultation with the State Energy Office of DBEDT and Hawaii Natural Energy Institute of UH, to develop a cooling master strategy and comprehensive retrofitting study for public schools and to report findings to the Legislature. Authorizes general obligation bonds and appropriates funds for efficient classroom-cooling demonstration projects. (HB759 HD1)
Title
Public Schools; Ideal Room Temperature; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/ENE/GVO, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU/ENE, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 74). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Kong, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tupola. |
2015-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |