HI HB76 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a $150 fine for traffic-control signal violations. Appropriates funds. (HB76 HD1)
Title
Traffic Violations; Fines
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 13 | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-09-09 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB601 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.