HI HB764 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB764
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an inter-division program between the State Historic Preservation Division, Land Division, Office of Conservation and Coastal Lands, Island Burial Councils, and the Office of Hawaiian Affairs that addresses the location, movement, and restoration of Hawaiian burial sites, or iwi, exposed or likely to be exposed to coastal erosion. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Burial Sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB764 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB734 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to JHA/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
SB734 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to JHA/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Burial Sites
Coastal Erosion
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
State Historic Preservation Division
Burial Sites
Coastal Erosion
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
State Historic Preservation Division
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=764&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB764_.HTM |