HI HB77 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Act 064, 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Act 064, 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the sale of the leased fee interest in certain affordable leasehold developments by the HHFDC from legislative approval. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Lands Controlled By The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Act 064, 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2021-06-24 | House | Act 064, on 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Chang, Gabbard, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 645) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Kim. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1682) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:55AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1228) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 28). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB689 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL/HOU, JDC.