HI HB775 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 157, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 157, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of business, economic development, and tourism for marketing Hawaii and Hawaii's higher education institutions to international students. (HB775 CD1)
Title
International Marketing and Recruitment; Higher Education; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act 157, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Act 157, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 45). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 45) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Choy, Nishimoto, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Ward. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 9:30AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 636). |
2015-04-24 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Nishimoto added as Co-Chair. Representative Cachola discharged as Co-Chair. |
2015-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 9:30AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Choy added as Co-Chair. Representative Ichiyama discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; English Co-Chair; Galuteria, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Ichiyama, Cachola Co-Chairs; Kong, Ward. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2015-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1141) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Tokuda. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to TSI, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HEA/TSI, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 227). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 785), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-03-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-03-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1187 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to HEA/TSI, WAM.