HI HB784 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB784
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires and appropriates funds for the Hawaii tourism authority to promote Hawaii's efforts to protect the environment, marine life conservation districts, and coral reefs and provide guidance on the dangers of sunscreens that contain oxybenzone and octinoxate and how tourists can help protect Hawaii's environment.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TIA, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB266 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB784 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB784 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=784&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB784_.HTM |