HI HB796 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB796
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to prohibit a person from serving as a member of the legislature for more than sixteen years during the person's lifetime.
Title
Proposing Amendments To Article Iii Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Establish Legislative Term Limits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-08-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1424 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB796 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB796 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=796&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB796_.HTM |