HI HB799 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 111, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 111, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the authority of the State, its employees and its independent contractors to kill or attempt to kill wildlife by aerial means in furtherance of official State duties. (SD1)
Title
Uniform Aeronautics Act; Wildlife Removal
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act 111, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212). |
2016-06-23 | House | Act 111, on 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212). |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Evans, Jordan, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, McDermott, McKelvey voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2016-05-05 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | House | Deferred one day 05-05-16. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Rhoads, Kawakami, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee will have decision making on Thursday 04-28-16 11:00AM in Conference Room 224. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Pouha. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 503) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3468) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-31-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2883) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to WLA, JDL. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 11). |
2016-02-16 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, McKelvey voting no (2) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-02-12 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 02-16-16. |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-01-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Woodson, McDermott. |
2016-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-28-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-01-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-28-16 2:00PM. |
2016-01-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |