HI HB805 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts federal veterans' disability benefits from claims of creditors and attachment, levy, and seizure to enforce a court judgment, except in certain child and spousal support cases. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD1)
Title
Veterans Disability Benefits; Attachment; Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Kong, Tokioka, Tupola. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 574) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:26AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-24-15 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Pouha voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 9:15AM in conference room 312. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-15 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-15. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-02-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |