HI HB809 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB809
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii broadband office within the Hawaii technology development corporation. Establishes the position of state broadband strategy officer. Renames the broadband assistance advisory council as the broadband advisory council and amends its purpose and membership. Requires the chief executive officer of the Hawaii technology development corporation to convene and chair the broadband advisory council. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Broadband.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 375) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-03-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB809 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Broadband Advisory Council
Hawaii Broadband Office
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Broadband Advisory Council
Hawaii Broadband Office
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation